THE TENNYSON SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conferences, lectures and events to promote knowledge and interest in the life and work of Alfred Tennyson. Publications including the annual 'Tennyson Research Bulletin'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Isle Of Wight
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 14 August 1973: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Marion Sherwood | Trustee | 14 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROF VALERIE PURTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF MARION SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ROGER EBBATSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR PETE MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSALIND BOYCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN BRUMBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR LEONEE ORMOND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.07k | £5.18k | £8.64k | £5.75k | £6.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.07k | £5.04k | £8.64k | £5.75k | £6.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 191 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 408 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED THE 31ST MAY 1973
Charitable objects
TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND KNOLEDGE OF LORD TENNYSON'S LIFE AND WORK AND FAMILY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TENNYSON SOCIETY
Lincolnshire Archives
St. Rumbolds Street
LINCOLN
LN2 5AB
- Phone:
- 01522687837
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window