WILLIAMSON TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of limited financial aid to elderly people aged over 65.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 15 August 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TRACY ANN FUENTES | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|||
ERIC HUGH McCASHEY | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|||
Alasdair James Russell | Trustee | 16 January 2017 |
|
|||
MARK NINHAM ROBINSON | Trustee | 14 February 2013 |
|
|||
MRS SUE GREGORY | Trustee |
|
||||
MRS GILL LOWE | Trustee |
|
||||
KATHRYN SMETHERS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.26k | £4.85k | £4.87k | £5.14k | £5.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.59k | £70 | £35 | £6.71k | £415 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 August 2024 | 304 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11/07/1973 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/01/2013
Charitable objects
ANY PERSONS AGED SIXTY FIVE AND UPWARDS ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF PITSTONE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF ANY HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PITSTONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 RUSHENDON FURLONG
PITSTONE
LEIGHTON BUZZARD
LU7 9QX
- Phone:
- 01296668809
- Website:
-
pitstone.co.uk/localinfo/the-williamson-trust
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window