THE CORNISH TALKING NEWSPAPER AND MAGAZINE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to provide a weekly 90 minute memory stick (USB) of local news, information, literature, both fiction and non fiction for the blind, visually impaired and those labouring under some temporary or permanent incapacity which makes reading a strain.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Cornwall
Governance
- 17 September 1973: Standard registration
- 23 August 2022: Funds received from 900237 NORTH CORNWALL AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSO...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Oliver | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mansell | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Evans | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor John Gardiner | Trustee | 03 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Fuller | Trustee | 03 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY ESTELLE KNOWLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JOHN HEATH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER MARY SALMON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.12k | £490 | £485 | £1.45k | £140 | |
|
Total expenditure | £792 | £1.29k | £1.61k | £2.10k | £1.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 18TH DAY OF JULY 1973, AND AMEDED 27TH NOVEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND OR THE PARTIALLY BLIND OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES FOR THE DISSEMINATION OF NEWS INFORMATION KNOWLEDGE AND LITERATURE BOTH FICTION AND NON FICTION.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF CORNWALL INCLUDING THE ISLES OF SCILLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 PARK VIEW
TRURO
TR1 2BW
- Phone:
- 01872273806
- Email:
- fjohnheath@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window