ORANGE TREE THEATRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a producing theatre-in-the-round with a full community and education programme, the Orange Tree promotes live theatre to as wide a community as possible, encourages new and "undiscovered" writing and offers resource to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£3,329,695
Donations and legacies | £1.07m | |
Charitable activities | £1.77m | |
Other trading activities | £43.86k | |
Investments | £11.11k | |
Other | £434.64k |
Total expenditure:
£2,409,172
Raising funds | £132.18k | |
Charitable activities | £2.28m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £109,894 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £132.18k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.28m | |
Retained for future use | £920.52k |
People

66 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 August 1978: Standard registration
- ORANGE TREE THEATRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judy Gibbons | Chair | 15 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Indiana Zilpah Lown-Collins | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Norman Marks | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Richard Buxton | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Marina Jones | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Lesley Morris | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Feras Al-Chalabi | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Corinne Meredith | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Anita Arora | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Victoria Kent | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Robert Peter Lisney | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Harriet Kate Varley | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Carolyn Tracey Backhouse | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
India Semper-Hughes | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.60m | £1.70m | £1.76m | £1.87m | £3.33m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.45m | £1.14m | £1.78m | £1.99m | £2.41m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £234.66k | £1.21m | £105.00k | £115.20k | £109.89k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £569.23k | £285.01k | £911.65k | £523.78k | £1.07m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £106.98k | £88.03k | £6.66k | £8.98k | £43.86k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £849.95k | £124.48k | £582.73k | £1.01m | £1.77m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £370 | £0 | £272 | £2.66k | £11.11k | |
|
Income - Other | £77.60k | £172 | £258.79k | £320.05k | £434.64k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £38.14k | £5.01k | £52.50k | £20.54k | £242.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.26m | £912.14k | £1.59m | £1.86m | £2.28m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £187.47k | £227.40k | £188.77k | £138.14k | £132.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £14.88k | £49.97k | £0 | £0 | £28.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £898.31k | £919.30k | £885.34k | £844.51k | £809.41k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £376.03k | £1.32m | £1.10m | £1.07m | £2.05m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £195.45k | £597.35k | £363.51k | £419.42k | £443.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 August 2021 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 13 August 2021 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH MAY 1973 AS AMENDED 20TH JULY 1978 AS AMENDED 13TH JUNE 1988 as amended on 08 Oct 2018 as amended on 13 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE RICHMOND
Contact information
- Address:
-
ORANGE TREE THEATRE
1 CLARENCE STREET
RICHMOND
TW9 2SA
- Phone:
- 02089400141
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window