THE SOUTHEND AND DISTRICT SOCIETY OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL REFEREES' BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assists Local Football Referees who are members of the Society should they require financial help when in difficulty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 17 September 1973: Standard registration
- THE CARRADUS CUP (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Masson | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Caton | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nick Janes | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Joseph Falvey | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47 | £17 | £22 | £52 | £150 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £500 | £105 | £1.01k | £1.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2025 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 23RD MAY 1973
Charitable objects
TO RENDER FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE TO MEMBERS, PAST MEMBERS OR THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
SOUTHEND AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 WOODSTOCK CRESCENT
HOCKLEY
SS5 4XG
- Phone:
- 01702206156
- Email:
- paul@falvey.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window