Accounts and annual returns THE BROWN SWISS CATTLE SOCIETY (UK)

Charity number: 266143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 06 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 06 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 07 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 07 December 2023 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2022 24 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 24 August 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 19 January 2021 On Time