BRITISH SOCIETY FOR POPULATION STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further the scientific study of biological, economic, historical, medical, social and other problems associated with human populations & to contribute to public awareness of these issues. Organises day meetings, workshops & an annual conference.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 September 1973: Standard registration
- B S P S (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Nicola Shelton | Chair | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Fiori | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen William Smallwood | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Sochas | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Eric Schneider | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lee Emma Palmer Williamson | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nitzan Peri-Rotem | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Melanie Dawn Channon | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Shireen Kanji | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alice Goisis | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jason Hilton | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rishita Nandagiri | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Walters | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Anthony Humby | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.57k | £16.18k | £17.42k | £67.19k | £102.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.60k | £11.82k | £15.43k | £59.50k | £102.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH JULY 1973
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO FURTHER THE SCIENTIFIC STUDY OF BIOLOGICAL, ECONOMIC, HISTORICAL, MEDICAL, SOCIAL AND OTHER PROBLEMS CONNECTED WITH HUMAN POPULATIONS AND TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THESE PROBLEMS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
POR.2.01
LONDON SCHOOL OF ECONOMICS & POLITI
HOUGHTON STREET
LONDON
WC2A 2AE
- Phone:
- 02079557666
- Email:
- pic@lse.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window