WORCESTER PARK AND NORTH CHEAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DRAMA, DANCE, FITNESS, TAEKWONDO, BADMINTON, SEQUENCE DANCING, WHIST DRIVE, PLAYGROUP, MUSICAL THEATRE, PILATES, YOGA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 12 September 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA RUBY DAVIS | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA IRENE DENISON | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
EVELYN PAMELA NORMAN | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARGARET PUSHONG | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE BENNETT | Trustee | 04 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANN MORRIS | Trustee | 15 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ANN SNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR LES JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE CRANFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS DOT SHEPPERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA SALLY DALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ANDY HOLLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.45k | £57.93k | £76.73k | £107.85k | £88.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.05k | £79.27k | £83.22k | £133.32k | £103.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.26k | £11.88k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 1973 AS AMENDED 12 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WORCESTER PARK AND NORTH CHEAM AND ADJACENT AREAS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN, MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WORCESTER PARK,NORTH CHEAM,ADJACENT AREAS THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elmcroft Centre
570 London Road
North cheam
North cheam
SM3 9AB
- Phone:
- 02086440592
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window