PSA PEUGEOT CITROEN CHARITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PSA Peugeot Citroen Charity Trust supports current company employees in their charitable & community work across the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 04 September 1973: Standard registration
- 27 October 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 27 October 2021: Funds transferred to 1117345 HEART OF ENGLAND COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
- PEUGEOT CHARITY TRUST (Working name)
- CHRYSLER UNITED KINGDOM CHARITABLE TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- PEUGEOT MOTOR COMPANY PLC CHARITY TRUST (Previous name)
- PEUGEOT TALBOT MOTOR CO PLC CHARITY TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57 | £73 | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.93k | £4.00k | £2.50k | £2.60k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 05 February 2021 | 371 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 08 July 2019 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEEDS DATED 4TH AUGUST 1970 AND 6TH FEBRUARY 1973 AS AMENDED 3RD OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PAY TO AND DIVIDE THE INCOME AMONG SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES AND IN SUCH SUMS AND AMOUNTS AND AT SUCH TIMES AS THE COMPANY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME APPOINT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window