WILTSHIRE WILDLIFE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To lead by example in delivering natures recovery, connecting all communities and generations with our natural world and empowering them to take meaningful and positive action for nature and the climate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£7,468,851
Donations and legacies | £1.54m | |
Charitable activities | £5.59m | |
Other trading activities | £154.77k | |
Investments | £124.44k | |
Other | £53.60k |
Total expenditure:
£6,319,934
Raising funds | £293.65k | |
Charitable activities | £6.03m | |
Other | £0 |
-£3,745 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £716,559 from 15 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £293.65k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.03m | |
Retained for future use | £1.15m |
People

90 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
2000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 03 September 1973: Standard registration
- 24 July 2024: Funds received from 1094746 SOUTH WEST WILDLIFE TRUSTS
- WILTSHIRE WILDLIFE TRUST (Working name)
- THE WILTSHIRE TRUST FOR NATURE CONSERVATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melanie Louise Henry | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Julian Roberston Crawford | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Gantlett | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip Heads | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dagmar Junghanns | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Gilson | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Goff | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Wyatt | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Piers Maynard | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Major General - Retd Charles Fattorini | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julian Robert Barlow | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.24m | £5.92m | £5.57m | £7.12m | £7.47m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.69m | £3.87m | £4.39m | £5.58m | £6.32m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £298.18k | £19.16k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £140.06k | £150.87k | £33.38k | £546.16k | £716.56k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £983.18k | £2.46m | £1.61m | £841.26k | £1.54m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £31.02k | £36.24k | £127.24k | £197.37k | £154.77k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.11m | £3.30m | £3.71m | £5.96m | £5.59m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £92.04k | £78.59k | £95.84k | £97.53k | £124.44k | |
|
Income - Other | £21.03k | £44.72k | £29.57k | £27.72k | £53.60k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £112.58k | £886.11k | £662.75k | £0 | £326.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.40m | £3.64m | £4.13m | £5.31m | £6.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £294.16k | £229.34k | £266.10k | £265.06k | £293.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £30.61k | £8.23k | £8.36k | £9.24k | £9.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £10.24k | £35.73k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.62m | £9.38m | £10.31m | £11.95m | £12.18m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £2.57m | £2.70m | £2.88m | £3.29m | |
|
Other assets | £1.78m | £2.88m | £3.09m | £3.01m | £3.69m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £354.20k | £490.15k | £299.26k | £343.64k | £549.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23RD JULY 1962 AMENDED 20 NOVEMBER 1992 & 6 NOVEMBER 2002. as amended on 18 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CONSERVATION MAINTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF: WILDLIFE AND ITS HABITATS; PLACES OF NATURAL BEAUTY; PLACES OF LANDSCAPE WITH GEOLOGICAL, PHYSIOGRAPHICAL, OR AMENITY VALUE IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN WAYS THAT FURTHER BIODIVERSITY. TO PROTECT AND SAFEGUARD THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROMOTING RE-USE AND RECYCLING AND THE PROVISION OF RECYCLING FACILITIES AS A MEANS OF WASTE DISPOSAL. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN: NATURE STUDY; THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT; THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF BIODIVERSITY CONSERVATION AND MATTERS RELATED TO RE-USE AND RECYCLING OF HOUSEHOLD & INDUSTRIAL WASTE. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH IN ALL BRANCHES OF NATURE STUDY AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ELM TREE COURT
LONG STREET
DEVIZES
WILTSHIRE
SN10 1NJ
- Phone:
- 01380 725670
- Email:
- info@wiltshirewildlife.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window