Financial history THE F A RILEY-SMITH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 266203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.24k £3.26k £3.34k £3.71k £3.96k
Total expenditure £4.27k £4.28k £2.28k £9.70k £3.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A