Accounts and annual returns EDWARD DIXON MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 266214
Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2022 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required