SOCIAL CENTRE, AVEBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Social Centre for the benefit of the inhabitants of the villages of Avebury, Beckhampton, Winterbourne Monkton and Berwick Bassett.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 04 October 1973: Standard registration
- AVEBURY SOCIAL CENTRE (Working name)
- THE AVEBURY VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY FARTHING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard William Nutt | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maggie Lewis | Trustee | 23 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Lyndsay Vivienne Bennett-Nutt | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
HELEN VICKERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL POLACK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH FARTHING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.53k | £11.46k | £24.38k | £9.92k | £7.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.24k | £5.02k | £10.93k | £8.23k | £14.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.36k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED THE 12TH JULY 1973
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE VILLAGES OF AVEBURY,WINTERBOURNE,MONKTON, AND BERWICK BASSETT IN THE COUNTY OF WILTSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS,INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS,LECTURES,AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION,WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Social Centre
High Street
AVEBURY
MARLBOROUGH
Wiltshire
SN8 1RF
- Phone:
- 01672539127
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window