ROMSEY OPPORTUNITY GROUP FOR CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE GROUP ENABLES YOUNG CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS THE OPPORTUNITY TO LEARN AND DEVELOP THROUGH PLAY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £990 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 05 August 1974: Standard registration
- ROMSEY OPPORTUNITY GROUP (Working name)
- THE ROMSEY OPPORTUNITY GROUP FOR HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN ROGERS | Chair | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Rebecca Louise Whettingsteel | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Emma Dale | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
RUTH TERESA MARTIN | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
MRS SUE FISHER | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
MR DICK HEWETT | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.85k | £10.84k | £20.23k | £24.95k | £16.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.65k | £13.33k | £19.51k | £15.95k | £20.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.19k | £2.00k | £990 | £990 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/06/1972 AS AMENDED ON 26/06/1974 AS AMENDED ON 09/11/2015 as amended on 26 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
2.1 THE AIMS OF THE GROUP ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE FROM ROMSEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY: A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, CARE FACILITIES AND FAMILY LEARNING; B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES; C) PROVIDING RESPITE AND SUPPORT FOR THE FAMILIES OF SUCH CHILDREN; D) AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN ROMSEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
ROMSEY AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
APPLETREE CENTRE
PRINCES ROAD
ROMSEY
SO51 8DS
- Phone:
- 07726 957735
- Email:
- rog@romseyopgroup.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window