THE EDWARDS - STEPTOE RESEARCH TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE MEDICAL KNOWLEDGE OF HUMAN REPRODUCTION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 January 1961: Standard registration
- 14 February 2025: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 14 February 2025: Funds transferred to 213280 ROYAL COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNAECOLOGISTS
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.72k | £4.56k | £4.35k | £4.07k | £147 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.00k | £6.00k | £2.00k | £2.50k | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH SEPTEMBER 1973. REGISTRATION DATE UNKNOWN FROM FILE RECORDS. DEFAULT DATE 01/01/61 RECORDED AS DATE OF REGISTRATION.
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE AND TREAT PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM DISORDERS WHICH GIVE RISE TO INFERTILITY. 2. TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE MEDICAL KNOWLEDGE OF HUMAN REPRODUCTION. 3. TO DEVELOP NEW METHODS OF CONTRACEPTION AND STERILISATION AND TO RESEARCH INTO METHODS OF PREVENTING OR ALLEVIATING GENETIC DEFECTS. 4. TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 5. TO ESTABLISH A TRAINING CENTRE FOT THE PURPOSE OF TEACHING THE ADVANCED TECHNIQUES WHICH MAY BE DEVELOPED FOT THE PURPOSES AFORESAID. 6. TO TRAIN PERSONNEL IN SUCH TECHNIQUES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window