ST HELIER & SURREY KPA (KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association is an unicorporated trust registered as a charity, a member of the National Kidney Federation and governed by a Constitution agreed by the Charity Commissioners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 January 1974: Standard registration
- ST HELIER ARTIFICIAL KIDNEY HOLIDAY AND AMENITY FUND (Previous name)
- ST HELIER ASSOCIATION FOR KIDNEY PATIENTS (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR. DAVE SPENSLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michael John Sealey | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fay Heather Eves | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.12k | £18.79k | £119.03k | £50.22k | £170.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.77k | £57.09k | £41.41k | £33.24k | £145.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH NOVEMBER 1973 AND AMENDED 12TH NOVEMBER 1974, 6TH NOVEMBER 1979, 13TH MAY 1990 AND 4TH NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM KIDNEY AND RELATED AILMENTS WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES AND ARE RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
L'ALISE
GUILDFORD ROAD
GODALMING
GU7 3BX
- Phone:
- 01483426276
- Email:
- DASPENSLEY@BTOPENWORLD.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window