Accounts and annual returns MUNDESLEY VOLUNTEER INSHORE LIFEBOAT LIMITED

Charity Number: 266406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 15 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 15 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 22 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 22 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 23 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 18 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 07 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 23 March 2021 46 days late Download Open in new window