Financial history MUNDESLEY VOLUNTEER INSHORE LIFEBOAT LIMITED

Charity Number: 266406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £96.21k £54.06k £74.53k £214.62k £132.68k
Total expenditure £68.53k £63.20k £95.80k £127.73k £133.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.91k £2.67k N/A N/A