PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Public Interest Research Centre is an independent charity focusing on issues that underpin the long-term public interest. We integrate key research on climate, energy & economics - widening its audience and increasing its impact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 November 1973: Standard registration
- PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH CENTRE (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Brisbane McKay | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Magee | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tamsyn Elizabeth Hyatt | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Akehurst | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Camilla Isabel Luff | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuelle Andrews | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £295.58k | £229.74k | £198.75k | £194.36k | £390.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £278.22k | £202.59k | £198.87k | £182.28k | £268.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH MAY 1973 as amended on 27 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO THE ORGANISATION AND ACTIVITY OR GOVERNMENT INDUSTRY BUSINESS TRADE THE PROFESSIONS AND THE SERVICES AND TO CALCULATE THEIR EFFECT UPON THE ENVIRONMENT AND LIFE OF THE COMMUNITY AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AVAILABLE TO AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PIRC
Y PLAS
MACHYNLLETH
POWYS
SY20 8ER
- Phone:
- 01654702277
- Email:
- info@publicinterest.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window