SALISBURY MUSICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to educate the public in the arts and science of music by performing choral concerts of high standard with soloists of national standing. It is a mixed choir of about 144 voices and performs major works from the choral scene, from traditional classical to modern. Most of its concerts are in Salisbury Cathedral but occasionally it combines with other choirs and performs abroad
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 10 December 1973: Standard registration
- S M S (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Les Rose | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Virginia Mackay | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Easton | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Nardone | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue Blyth | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Goodman | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Beverley | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Tawney | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
LUKE HENRY WALTER MARCH | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.15k | £10.84k | £50.13k | £39.80k | £34.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.09k | £11.32k | £47.31k | £30.44k | £29.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 9TH OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED 18 MARCH 1980, 12 OCTOBER 1999 AND 2 OCTOBER 2007 as amended on 26 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS ITS COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
SALISBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Cornwall Road
SALISBURY
SP1 3NH
- Phone:
- 07977994417
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window