VILLAGE HALL HOPTON-ON-SEA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall used by local clubs and groups and for private parties
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 18 December 1973: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL HOPTON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL KEITH PEARCE | Chair | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Johnson | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Keith Ian Bradley | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jan Windsor-Luck | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zandra Ward | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY MARY PEARCE | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|||||
MAUREEN MCGOVERN | Trustee | 08 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.64k | £26.57k | £38.69k | £33.63k | £37.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.56k | £32.24k | £32.02k | £37.12k | £48.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 02/07/1953 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17/05/1978 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 09/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06/12/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05/08/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04 MAY 2016 as amended on 06 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HOPTON-ON-SEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hopton Village Hall
Station Road
Hopton
GREAT YARMOUTH
NR31 9BE
- Phone:
- 01502730768
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window