Accounts and annual returns THE CUMBERLAND TRUST

Charity number: 266475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required