THE ASSOCIATION OF BRITISH PICTURE RESTORERS FOUNDERS MEMORIAL BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fund was established as a Trust in 1950, with the aim to make 'grants out of the Trust Fund for the relief of Members of the Association who are in necessitous circumstances.' These may be unexpected occurrences which affect the professional life of a Member. Whether it is an accident, a bereavement or illness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 December 1973: Standard registration
- BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF PAINTINGS CONSERVATOR-RESTORERS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Padfield | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Sanderson | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Meese | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84 | £55 | £2 | £59 | £259 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.40k | £0 | £500 | £36 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND MARCH 1950
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION OF BRITISH PICTURE RESTORERS OR THEIR SERVANTS OR OTHER PERSONS ENGAGED IN THE PROFESSION OF PICTURE RESTORERS WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rose Green
Broomham Lane
Whitesmith
LEWES
BN8 6JQ
- Phone:
- 07989559346
- Email:
- benevolentfund1950@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window