ST MATTHEW HOUSING

Charity number: 266521
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Matthew Housing provides supported accommodation for single people who are either homeless or unsuitably housed. We provide resettlement support to enable residents to successfully move on to independent accommodation, and outreach support to external clients who are at risk of losing their tenancies and becoming homeless.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Essex
  • Lincolnshire
  • Norfolk
  • Northamptonshire
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 1973: Standard registration
  • 11 June 2008: Removed (Exempt charity)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • CARR-GOMM SOCIETY (EAST ANGLIA) LIMITED (Previous name)
  • CARR-GOMM SOCIETY (NORFOLK) LIMITED (Previous name)
  • ST MATTHEW SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007
Total gross income £5.44m £5.58m £6.23m £6.68m
Total expenditure £5.11m £5.64m £6.94m £7.34m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £138.25k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £6.54m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £2.88k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £7.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £3.72k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A £3.99m
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A £1.16m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A £2.32m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 23 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 14 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 14 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 22 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 22 December 2004 On Time