Accounts and annual returns THE INSTITUTE OF CIVIL DEFENCE AND DISASTER STUDIES

Charity Number: 266522
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 12 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 09 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 18 November 2008 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 16 July 2008 259 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 21 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required