HASTINGS AND DISTRICT ST. RAPHAEL CLUB FOR THE PHYSICALLY DISABLED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a day centre for the elderly and disabled. We arrange games, outings and general entertainment and encourage people to mix and mingle with each other. Transport is provided for those that need it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 05 December 1973: Standard registration
- 14 May 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE HASTINGS AND DISTRICT ST RAPHAEL CLUB FOR HANDICAPPED PERSONS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2004 | 31/01/2005 | 31/01/2006 | 31/01/2007 | 31/01/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.45k | £14.29k | £13.47k | £8.96k | £11.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.10k | £16.26k | £12.05k | £9.61k | £12.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2009 | 19 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | 07 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | 08 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2007 | 31 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2006 | 20 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2006 | 20 September 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2005 | 28 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2005 | 28 November 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 26TH JANUARY 1972, AS AMENDED 25TH JULY 1973, 9TH APRIL 1997 AND 7TH MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
THE CLUB IS ESTABLISHED TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR ITS MEMBERS AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH ALL VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY BODIES CONCERNED WITH THE WELFARE OF THE HANDICAPPED.
Area of benefit
HASTINGS AND ST. LEONARDS AND ADJACENT DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window