GUILDFORD CLUB FOR DISABLED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Guildford Club for Disabled provides social support for the physically disabled which results in additional needs and requirements. The Club strives to provide wide ranging entertainment that caters for most age groups and their tastes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 December 1973: Standard registration
- THE GUILDFORD CLUB FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Hazzard | Chair | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Diana Saulis | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelvin David Pritchard | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hammond | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hammond | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN PARSONS | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.41k | £5.69k | £2.73k | £6.29k | £9.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.72k | £5.08k | £3.03k | £8.81k | £8.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH NOVEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED ON 23/04/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE DISABLED WITHIN A RADIUS OF THREE MILES OF THE TOWN OF GUILDFORD, SURREY IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
A RADIUS OF THREE MILES OF GUILDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jacobs Well Village Hall
Jacobs Well Road
Jacob's Well
GUILDFORD
GU4 7PD
- Phone:
- 07538879264
- Website:
-
guildfordclubfordisabled.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window