TABEEL TRUST

Charity number: 266645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Primarily, but not exclusively, to support evangelical Christian activities in which trustees already have an interest.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024

Total income: £23,312
Total expenditure: £117,782

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 January 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward Jackson Clark Trustee 03 November 2018
ARBORFIELD AND BARKHAM PARISH CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
Helen Clare Hamer Trustee 04 November 2017
Acorn AP Tendring
Received: 15 days late
Nigel Thomas Davey Trustee
EBENEZER TRUST
Received: On time
STOCK VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
STOCK VILLAGE HALL
Recently registered
Dr MARY PAULINE CLARK Trustee
THE SEVEN FIFTY TRUST
Received: On time
JAMES DOUGLAS DAVEY Trustee
None on record
JEAN ANN RICHARDSON Trustee
None on record
BARBARA JANE CARTER Trustee
None on record
SARAH JANE TAYLOR Trustee
None on record
DOUGLAS KENNETH BROWN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £23.74k £22.94k £21.11k £25.04k £23.31k
Total expenditure £142.98k £88.65k £99.57k £88.42k £117.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 13 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2023 15 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 15 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
East Dalcove House
Kelso
TD5 7PD
Phone:
01573460395
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available