THE ROYAL LONDON HOSPITAL KIDNEY PATIENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Medical/health/sickness Disability Sport/recreation Greater London/Essex/Hertfordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 April 1974: Standard registration
- THE ROYAL LONDON HOSPITAL KPA (Working name)
- HANBURY ASSOCIATION FOR RENAL PATIENTS (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shaun Todd | Chair | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GRACEY | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES BOOTH | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Conrad Ryan | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Smith | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Denise Todd | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Maloney | Trustee | 13 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carl Postbeschild | Trustee | 13 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Barrett | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marie Niven | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARK O'CALLAGHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.12k | £14.66k | £6.81k | £10.47k | £13.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.38k | £14.42k | £16.41k | £14.15k | £10.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH FEBRUARY 1974 AND AMENDED 21ST MARCH 1974, 1986, 22ND OCTOBER 1987 AND 13TH OCTOBER 1988 AND SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 20TH NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST PERSONS SUFFERING FROM KIDNEY DISEASE WHO ARE PATIENTS OF THE ROYAL LONDON AND ST. BARTHOLOMEW'S HOSPITAL, AND ASSOCIATED RENAL UNITS, I.E., UNDER THE ADMINISTRATIVE CARE OF THE BARTS AND THE LONDON NHS TRUST; AND 2. TO ASSIST THE FAMILIES OF SUCH RENAL PATIENTS AS DEFINED ABOVE WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
189 Carlton Road
ROMFORD
RM2 5AX
- Phone:
- 07973309269
- Email:
- rlhkpa@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window