FRIENDS OF UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON HOSPITALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of facilities and amenities to patients and staff of UCLH Foundation Trust hospitals in addition to those funded by the NHS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Camden
Governance
- 09 January 1974: Standard registration
- 19 April 2012: Funds received from 1093735 THE FRIENDS OF ST PANCRAS HOSPITAL
- THE FRIENDS OF UNIVERSITY COLLEGE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diana Mary Scarrott | Chair | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Peter Bexson | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham David Cooper | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Greg Hughes | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Brantingham | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jo Baktis | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ros Jacobs | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev PETER DAVID OWEN HARRIES OP | Trustee | 14 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Angela Wedgwood | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.46k | £77.53k | £64.35k | £64.77k | £67.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.90k | £135.40k | £149.40k | £171.08k | £78.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/11/1973 AS AMENDED ON 25/06/1997 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/2007 AS AMENDED ON 23/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 11/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS, FORMER PATIENTS, STAFF AND FORMER STAFF OF THE HOSPITALS AND OTHER PERSONS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
University College London Hospitals Charity
5th Floor East
250 Euston Road
London
NW1 2PG
- Phone:
- 02034479931
- Email:
- uclh.friendsofuclh@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window