Financial history MARGARET QUILLER COUCH

Charity number: 266698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.51k £9.76k £32.22k £22.93k £22.67k
Total expenditure £22.02k £17.02k £18.73k £22.34k £26.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £17.60k N/A N/A