MARGARET QUILLER COUCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sport/recreation small snooker and reading room
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 30 March 1976: Standard registration
- ROWETT INSTITUTE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Hayward | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robin Davis | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Michael Wakeham | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RALPH MARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN JOHN JOSLIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.51k | £9.76k | £32.22k | £22.93k | £22.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.02k | £17.02k | £18.73k | £22.34k | £26.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2024 | 311 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 June 2022 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT BODMIN 14TH JUNE 1933 (UV 261 PAGES 129 AND 130)
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE INSTITUTE AND READING ROOM AT POLPERRO.
Area of benefit
POLPERRO
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rowett Institute
The Coombes
POLPERRO
LOOE
PL13 2RG
- Phone:
- 01503273290
- Email:
- rowett601@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window