KING GEORGE'S FIELD, SARRATT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain and improve land and buildings at King George V Playing Fields Sarratt for the benefit of the local community. The facilities provided include football, cricket, tennis and indoor bowls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 10 April 1974: Standard registration
- KING GEORGE'S FIELD (Previous name)
- KING GEORGE'S FIELD, SARRAT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL GOVIER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Angela Coakley | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Sarah Dobson | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ian Drummond | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Andrew Shurville | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Young | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Coleman | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Rugg | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Haynes | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Turner | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HILDICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.85k | £11.70k | £12.43k | £13.23k | £10.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.61k | £16.43k | £9.96k | £11.80k | £7.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 March 2022 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THREE CONVEYANCES DATED 15TH MAY 1932, 31ST MARCH AND 8TH JULY 1939 AND DECLARATION DATED 19TH JULY 1939 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 15TH DECEMBER 1994 as amended on 05 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE LAND TO BE HOLD BY THE TRUSTEES AS PUBLIC GROUND UNDER THE RECREATION GROUND ACT, 1859 FOR USE AS A PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE PARISH OF SARRATT IN THE COUNTY OF HERTFORD.
Area of benefit
SARRATT
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Highfields
Love Lane
Kings Langley
WD4 9JT
- Phone:
- 07740542221
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window