Accounts and annual returns ARGOSY PLAYERS

Charity number: 266728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 22 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 22 February 2025 359 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 30 December 2023 305 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 08 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required