Financial history ARGOSY PLAYERS

Charity number: 266728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £20.68k £712 £3.31k £10.43k £14.57k
Total expenditure £20.65k £2.74k £5.67k £9.39k £13.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A