ARGOSY PLAYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur Dramatics- straight plays, musicals and pantomimes, staged variously at the Compass Theatre, Ickenham, and the Winston Churchill Hall, Ruislip. The pantomime always has one performance that is free to local deserving groups. Club members also act as unpaid volunteers to run the facilities at the Compass Theatre. The Club is a member of the Hillingdon Arts Association & NODA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 14 December 1973: Standard registration
- W (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geraldine Green | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carmel Bass | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
phil Gossan | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Darrin Reeves | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.68k | £712 | £3.31k | £10.43k | £14.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.65k | £2.74k | £5.67k | £9.39k | £13.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 22 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 February 2025 | 359 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 December 2023 | 305 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 OCTOBER 1973 AS AMENDED 17 JUNE 1975, 27 JUNE 1995 AND 21 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC ARTS, IN FURTHERANCE OF WHICH, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE CLUB SHALL HAVE POWER; (A) TO PRESENT DRAMATIC ENTERTAINMENTS OF AN EDUCATIONAL VALUE, (B) TO STUDY AND PROVIDE INSTRUCTION IN DRAMA AND ITS APPLIED ARTS; (C) TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF DRAMATIC ART IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON ON A NON-PROFIT MAKING BASIS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
141 Glebe Avenue
Ickenham
UXBRIDGE
Middlesex
UB10 8PF
- Phone:
- 07946 716469
- Email:
- info@argosyplayers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window