Financial history SANDWICH TOLL BRIDGE FUND

Charity number: 266738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £191.28k £125.73k £395.87k £229.86k £288.96k
Total expenditure £307.07k £183.49k £444.22k £376.34k £360.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.35k N/A N/A N/A