SOUTH WEST COAST PATH ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To secure the protection, improvement and preservation of an acceptable south west coast path (SWCP) and public access thereto in order to improve the conditions of users of the SWCP. To educate users of the SWCP to greater knowledge of respect and care for the coast and countryside. To provide advice and information to those who walk the SWCP. To encourage all to take on healthy outdoor walking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Total income:
£538,012
Donations and legacies | £158.14k | |
Charitable activities | £336.46k | |
Other trading activities | £42.25k | |
Investments | £1.16k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£387,948
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £354.21k | |
Other | £0 |
£1,989 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £23,847 from government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £33.74k | |
Charitable expenditure | £354.21k | |
Retained for future use | £150.06k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £33.74k | |
Charitable expenditure | £354.21k | |
Retained for future use | £152.05k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 16 September 1974: Standard registration
- 20 September 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 September 2016: Funds transferred to 1163422 SOUTH WEST COAST PATH ASSOCIATION
- SOUTH WEST COAST PATH ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- SOUTH WEST PENINSULA COASTAL PATH ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE SOUTH WEST WAY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.25k | £90.25k | £112.27k | £271.34k | £538.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.75k | £81.54k | £104.53k | £216.88k | £387.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £23.85k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £158.14k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £42.25k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £336.46k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.16k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £41.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £354.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £439.24k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £105.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 12 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 12 August 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 30 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 16 September 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 16 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 02 October 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 22 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 30 April 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAY 1974 AND SCHEME OF 10 JUNE 1975 AS AMENDED ON 26 APRIL 1997 AND 24 APRIL 1999
Charitable objects
(1) TO SECURE THE PROTECTION, IMPROVEMENT AND PRESERVATION OF AN ACCEPTABLE SOUTH WEST COAST PATH AND PUBLIC ACCESS THERETO IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE USERS OF THE SOUTH WEST WAY (2) TO EDUCATE THE USERS OF THE SOUTH WEST WAY TO A GREATER KNOWLEDGE OF, RESPECT AND CARE FOR THE COAST AND THE COUNTRYSIDE
Area of benefit
SOUTH WEST ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window