YOUNG ACTORS' THEATRE ISLINGTON

Charity number: 266765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotes and advances the education of children and young people, particularly in the art of drama, by means of giving instruction in and promoting a study practice programme and teaching of all subjects connected with theatre and drama.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 January 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE ANNA SCHER CHILDREN'S THEATRE LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Cartwright Chair 14 September 2018
None on record
Miriam Jordan Keane Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Jodie Suzanne Woolfson Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Nicholas Brown Trustee 28 November 2018
None on record
Tristan McCarthy Trustee 17 August 2017
None on record
STEPHEN ROBERT ARTHUR COLEGRAVE Trustee
None on record
NEIL VICKERS Trustee
ANGEL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £464.28k £459.25k £436.79k £435.19k £558.84k
Total expenditure £424.29k £390.54k £408.41k £491.19k £546.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.52k £105.74k £8.48k £8.48k £2.05k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £31.33k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £20.23k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £462.79k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.67k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £42.82k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £544.38k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.54k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £146.29k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £186.16k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £23.05k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
70-72 BARNSBURY ROAD
LONDON
N1 0ES
Phone:
02072782101