Financial history THE AVON TALKING MAGAZINE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 266766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £6.58k £712 £1.47k £995 £1.33k
Total expenditure £4.97k £1.94k £3.16k £2.21k £2.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A