GEDDINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the purposes of a Village Hall for the use of the inhabitants of the parish of Geddington and its immediate vicinity without distinction of political, religious or other opinion including use for meetings, lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation with the objects of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 05 November 1976: Standard registration
- THE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryan Thomas McCreery | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Garley | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steve Humphreys | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN RAYMOND LEATON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE BIDDLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA COURTNEY-DEAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.57k | £21.61k | £26.22k | £20.58k | £20.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.76k | £12.90k | £22.48k | £22.06k | £19.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.60k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 11TH MARCH 1931 AND SCHEME OF THE 6TH AUGUST 1976
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GEDDINGTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS,LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
GEDDINGTON AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 SKEFFINGTON CLOSE
GEDDINGTON
KETTERING
NN14 1BA
- Phone:
- 07342251687
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window