Governing document AQUABILITY
Charity number: 266800

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH MARCH 1975 AS AMENDED ON 22 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 12 NOV 2016 as amended on 29 Aug 2022 as amended on 28 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE DISABLED WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THERAPEUTIC BENEFIT DERIVED FROM SWIMMING AND RELATED EXERCISES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
DORSET HAMPSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.