MERCHANT NAVY LOCOMOTIVE PRESERVATION SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object and principal activity of the M.N.L.P.S. is to preserve and maintain in an operational condition, to main line standards, ex-British Railways Southern Region 'Merchant Navy' Class locomotive No. 35028 'Clan Line' and to encourage and promote public interest in the preservation of steam and other railway locomotives and rolling stock, railway machinery & equipment of historical interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
92 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 June 1975: Standard registration
- M N L P S LTD (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Howard George Reynolds | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Graham Holman | Trustee | 10 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Paul McPherson | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Desmond Philip Shepherd | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Cummins | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Millward | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Mowat | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Alexander Charles Martin | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MARTIN ELLICK | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.00k | £57.73k | £164.32k | £177.02k | £298.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.00k | £34.64k | £70.04k | £200.87k | £248.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST MAY 1973 AND AMENDED 22ND MARCH 1975
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN IN OPERATIONAL CONDITIONS EX SOUTHERN REGION MERCHANT NAVY CLASS LOCOMOTIVE "35028" "CLAN LINE" AS AT THE TIME OF WITHDRAWAL AND TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE PRESERVATION OF STEAM AND OTHER RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVES AND ROLLING STOCK MACHINERY AND EQUIPMENT OF HISTOICAL INTEREST AND IN RAILWAYS LOCOMOTIVES ROLLING STOCK AND RAILWAY MACHINERY AND EQUIPMENT GENERALLY. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Burrage Road
REDHILL
RH1 1TL
- Phone:
- 07751 613221
- Email:
- secretary@clan-line.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window