SIDDINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is the "provision and maintenance of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of Siddington without distinction of political, religious, or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures and classes, and for other forms of recreation, and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 22 October 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Robert Young | Chair | 19 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Maxine Harrison | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marjory Alice Jarvis | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Badger | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penny Henty | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Kenrick Hayward | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Christopher Charles Tye | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kim Tye | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Vickers | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.74k | £9.26k | £7.97k | £12.39k | £16.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.68k | £11.65k | £7.26k | £10.95k | £9.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.23k | N/A | N/A | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 July 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 4TH MARCH 1975 as amended on 22 Nov 2018 as amended on 17 Nov 2020 as amended on 23 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SIDDINGTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SIDDINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Roberts Lodge
Siddington
CIRENCESTER
Gloucestershire
GL7 6EX
- Phone:
- 01285659486
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window