SWAFFHAM COMMUNITY HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 266832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The League of Friends is an organisation that helps to raise funds for equipment and ammenities for the patients and staff, over and above the annual budget of the hospital and occasionally the three doctors surgeries that support the hospital. The Charity are affiliated to the national body known as ATTEND who have been enhancing health and social care since 1948.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,500
Total expenditure: £2,316

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 February 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE SWAFFHAM HOSPITAL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLIN HOUGHTON Chair 12 January 2015
None on record
Gill Burns Trustee 28 September 2020
None on record
Jan Buckleystevens Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.03k £12.91k £2.56k £3.24k £3.50k
Total expenditure £5.44k £6.67k £4.47k £3.49k £2.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Warstade Way
SWAFFHAM
PE37 7NX
Phone:
07767262108
Website:

swaffham-hospital-league-of-friends.co.uk