Governing document THE SUFFOLK GUILD OF RINGERS FOR THE DIOCESE OF ST EDMUNDSBURY AND IPSWICH

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH OCTOBER 1975 AND AMENDED 17TH SEPTMBER 1977 21ST APRIL 1979, 25TH APRIL 1987 AND 9TH APRIL 1988 AND 21ST APRIL 1990 AND 19 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED ON 06 APR 2002 AS AMENDED ON 26 APR 2003 AS AMENDED ON 17 APR 2004 AS AMENDED ON 22 APR 2006 AS AMENDED ON 05 APR 2008 AS AMENDED ON 18 APR 2009 AS AMENDED ON 10 APR 2010 AS AMENDED ON 06 APR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 22 APR 2017 as amended on 26 Apr 2003 as amended on 27 Apr 2019 as amended on 27 Apr 2019 as amended on 23 Apr 2022 as amended on 25 Jan 2023 as amended on 31 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE GUILD SHALL PROMOTE RINGING FOR DIVINE SERVICE WITHIN THE DIOCESE OF ST EDMUNDSBURY AND IPSWICH BY: 1 PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE PRACTICE OF BELLRINGING. 2 SUPPORTING THE RECRUITMENT AND TRAINING OF BELLRINGERS. 3 CULTIVATING THE ART OF SCIENTIFIC RINGING. 4 PROMOTING AN APPRECIATION OF THE RINGING CHAMBER AS PART OF GOD'S HOUSE AND ENCOURAGING CARE AND ATTENTION TO ITS CLEANLINESS AND PROPER EQUIPMENT. 5 PROMOTING THE PRESERVATION OF BELLS IN AN EFFICIENT CONDITION, RECOMMENDING NECESSARY REPAIRS AND RENOVATIONS AND PROVIDING RELIABLE INFORMATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE ON THE CONDITION OF THE BELLS AND THEIR FITTINGS. 6 SUPPORTING RESTORATION AND/OR AUGMENTATION.?
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.