FENITON YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a safe place for youth and community groups to meet. Fund raising for the provision and improvement of facilities at the site. Liaising with other community agents to facilitate a spread of Children's, Youth and other community provision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 19 February 1974: Standard registration
- FENITON YOUTH CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LISA GORMAN | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Brian Harper | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Marshall DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.21k | £2.07k | £8.49k | £11.61k | £10.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.83k | £2.86k | £5.37k | £5.46k | £9.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £250 | £250 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 April 2021 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 3RD SEPTEMBER 1973 as amended on 27 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
A YOUTH CENTRE FOR THE USE OF ALL PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 21 YEARS EITHER RESIDING IN THE PARISH OF FENITON IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON OR RESIDING ELSEWHERE BUT BEING A MEMBER OF ONE OF THE ORGANISATIONS ENTITLED TO APPOINT A REPRESENTATIVE MEMBER HELPING AND EDUCATING GIRLS AND BOYS AND THEIR FRIENDS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FENITON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cedars
Dunkeswell
HONITON
Devon
EX14 4QJ
- Phone:
- 01404850243
- Email:
- anthonyharper@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window