THE CORNWALL BUILDINGS PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and restoration of buildings of architectural or historic interest anywhere within Cornwall or the Isles of Scilly. The charity operates on a rolling fund basis, by utilising its funds to buy, restore and sell. In the light of the increasingly difficult property market, greater emphasis will in future be put on working in partnership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £91,578 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Isles Of Scilly
Governance
- 28 January 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Highton | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Wingfield | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Gardner | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Schmitz | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin Perry | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Worden | Trustee | 29 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas M Cattaneo | Trustee | 29 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
KERI PARKINSON | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN PRITCHARD | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Georgina Jane McLaren | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.16k | £51.49k | £10.84k | £23.13k | £130.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.01k | £48.32k | £60.10k | £29.17k | £58.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £51.48k | £10.84k | £1.42k | £91.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 April 2024 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 April 2024 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 06 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND RESTORE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION PROPERTY IN CORNWALL AND THE ISLES OF SCILLY IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY BUILDINGS AS DEFINED IN SECTION 336(1) OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1990) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORIC, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
CORNWALL AND THE ISLE OF SCILLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Truro Library
Union Place
TRURO
TR1 1EP
- Phone:
- 01872 274766
- Email:
- trustees@cornwallbpt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window