CHURCH PLOT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Letting of allotments
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 11 February 1974: Standard registration
- ST GILES CHURCH STANTON ST QUINTIN P C C (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Adam Beaumont | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Parsons | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Raines | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Morgan | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD NICHOLAS GREENE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR I RANDALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Angela Yvonne Smith | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STANTON ST QUINTIN PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET VINES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY ANNE GREENE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124 | £124 | £160 | £189 | £229 | |
|
Total expenditure | £124 | £124 | £160 | £189 | £229 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AWARD MADE IN 1783 (AC REPORTS - WILTS (VOL 1) PAGE 910)
Charitable objects
APPLIED FOR GENERAL CHURCH EXPENSES.
Area of benefit
STANTON ST QUINTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 BOUVERIE PARK
STANTON ST. QUINTIN
CHIPPENHAM
SN14 6EE
- Phone:
- 01666837844
- Email:
- iamhilarygreene@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window