THE NORTH WYMONDHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The community centre is hired out - private parties and social activities, including exercise classes, tai chi groups, slimming world, brownies, archery. slow theatre, line dancing, keep fit, art groups, meeting place for over 60's and is also used as a polling station during elections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £462 from 2 government contract(s) and £75 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 25 January 1974: Standard registration
- 05 April 2022: Funds received from 1055765 WYMONDHAM DAY CENTRE ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW WILLIAM BEER | Chair | 18 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER ANDREW DAVIS | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Kutesko | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.64k | £14.00k | £6.77k | £19.41k | £18.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.35k | £18.67k | £5.25k | £19.63k | £12.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £462 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £2.50k | £75 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH NOVEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED ON 25TH MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH WYMONDHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD AND TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME.
Area of benefit
NORTH WYMONDHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEDDONS HOUSE
7 Hewitts Lane
WYMONDHAM
NR18 0JA
- Phone:
- 01953605064
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window